+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 337, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2538.)
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing September 8.
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 2. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13).
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1092.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 916.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB646 Hertzberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
September 8, 2021: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
September 2, 2021: SB 646 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Reyes
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB646 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor