+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 989.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 946.) (May 2).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 13, 2017: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
May 8, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB642 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor