+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7089.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 18.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 16.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 8.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: SB 635 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 80
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB635 Hueso et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB635 Hueso
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
January 8, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor