+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1106.) (May 16).
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB633
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 24, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7