+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 2428.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 8).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 20, 2015: Unfinished Business SB631 Hueso Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
July 16, 2015: SB 631 Hueso Senate Third Reading By RENDON
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
July 8, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
April 27, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB631 Hueso
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
April 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor