+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor