+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 7. Page 5364.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 18).
- Coauthors revised.
On August 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1).
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB629 McGuire et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
August 30, 2020: SB 629 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Kamlager
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 23
August 18, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 5, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2020: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2019: Consent Calendar SB629
- Yeas: 38
May 1, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7