+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 465, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2584.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2969.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 25 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 9).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 7, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB626 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
September 5, 2017: SB 626 Dodd Third Reading Urgency By AGUIAR-CURRY
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB626 Newman
- Yeas: 40
May 9, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1