+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2273.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2626.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1026.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12).
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14).
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2015: Unfinished Business SB626 McGuire Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: SB 626 McGuire Senate Third Reading By DODD
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 16
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 16
May 18, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB626 McGuire
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 11
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor