+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On July 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 21, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
June 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB625 Caballero et al.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14