+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- January 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 20.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 18.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2754.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 12.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
January 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor