+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 799.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 6, 2017: SB 621 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 28, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 7, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB621 Bradford
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor