+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2635.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2934.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2780.)
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 2787.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1228.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 685.) (April 6).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (11)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB62 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
September 8, 2021: SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 11
September 3, 2021: SB 62 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 8
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
June 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor