+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On September 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3011.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 25).
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 15).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB62 Lieu Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2013: SB 62 Lieu Senate Third Reading By PAN
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 24
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB62 Price
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor