+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 431, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2904.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3036.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1136.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 784.) (April 19).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2017: Special Consent Calendar SB618
- Yeas: 40
September 7, 2017: SB 618 Bradford Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E.
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 10, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
June 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB618 Bradford
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor