+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 854.) (April 26).
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB617 Bradford
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor