+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 22 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2914.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2894.) (January 13).
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 13.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 2
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2016: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd SB616 Huff
- Yeas: 40
January 13, 2016: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor