+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died at Desk.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held at desk.
- Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4544.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 23.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 18, 2014: Unfinished Business SB616 Roth Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 14, 2014: SB 616 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 23, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB616 Wright By Roth
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 14, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor