+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3492.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 18).
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1312.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 855.) (April 25).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 625.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 15, 2017: SB 613 De León Senate Third Reading By KALRA
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB613 De León
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 4, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor