+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2906.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1135.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 25).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 14, 2017: Special Consent Calendar SB612
- Yeas: 40
September 11, 2017: SB 612 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By RUBIO
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB612 Mitchell
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor