+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
On September 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1170.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 665.) (April 23).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected January 22.)
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Yee
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor