+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 6169.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 7078.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 6472.)
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21).
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 985.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published April 18 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 620.) (April 5).
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2018: SB 607 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB607 Skinner et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2018: SB 607 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 8
May 8, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB607 Skinner et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1