+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 729.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: [First] hearing set for [04-22-2015]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 5
April 22, 2015: [First] hearing set for [04-22-2015]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor