+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5167.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3254.)
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Re-referred to Coms. on APPR. and RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected October 10).
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 2690.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 18).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 944.) (May 3).
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
May 17, 2018: Unfinished Business SB606 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2018: SB 606 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By RUBIO
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 4
September 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2017: SB 606 Skinner Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E. Amend By GARCIA, E. Set #1
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 13
July 18, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 5
June 29, 2017: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 15, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SB606 McGuire
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1