+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On September 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 523, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 69(e) suspended. (Page 6704.)
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6704.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6704.)
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6704.)
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6705.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4983.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4840.)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 25.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4676.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1017.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 789.) (May 1).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Supp 3 SB605 Lara et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
August 20, 2014: SB 605 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 8
August 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB605 Lara
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor