+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 854, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2910.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and G.O.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & E.D.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 4, 2019: Unfinished Business SB601 Morrell et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: SB 601 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
August 21, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 19
May 16, 2019: Consent Calendar SB601
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16