+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On June 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 19, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: Consent Calendar SB60
- Yeas: 38
March 26, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor