+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 659, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5228.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 986.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 479.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 11.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING, and JUD.
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
- (Corrected December 9).
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2022: SB 6 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Wicks
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
August 29, 2022: Unfinished Business SB6 Caballero et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB6 Caballero et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 10, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor