+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5382.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 10).
On July 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2022: SB 599 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Quirk
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 20
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB599 Hueso Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 10, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 5
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
June 9, 2022: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 10, 2021: Consent Calendar SB599
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor