+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2408.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2390.)
- Set for hearing September 11.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2276.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3029.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on JUD.) suspended. (Page 2513.)
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On August 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 787.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Business SB594 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
September 11, 2013: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
September 9, 2013: SB 594 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
August 15, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 8, 2013: Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB594 Steinberg
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Education.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor