+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 17, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor