+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2709.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected September 2).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 29).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29 in L. & I.R. pending receipt.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (14)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB588 De León Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2015: SB 588 De León Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB588 De León
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2