+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 23).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor