+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8).
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB581 Caballero
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor