+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 14.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12.
On December 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1