+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2823.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20).
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 20.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 18.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 12.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
January 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB579 Allen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
January 20, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
January 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor