+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 1057.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 684.) (April 6).
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB576 Archuleta
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
April 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor