+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 985.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 12 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2