+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1103.) (May 16).
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 844.) (April 24).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 715.) (April 10).
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
May 29, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB574 Leyva
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 24, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor