+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 28).
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 9
July 1, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 9
June 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Pan
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor