+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 776, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3177.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1095.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 30).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2013: SB 57 Lieu Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2013: Unfinished Supp 1 SB57 Lieu Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
June 25, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB57 Lieu
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor