+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 668.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 10.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 10, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor