+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3).
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB563
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
April 29, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor