+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 27 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R.
On January 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4125.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4043.) (January 16).
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 16.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 10.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 26 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Gaines et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
January 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor