+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 5391.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and H. & C.D.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: SB 561 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 7
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB561 Dodd Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2022: Be re-referred to the Committees on [Accountability and Administrative Review] and [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 10, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB561 Dodd
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 20, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor