+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1388.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 456.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 10.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 22, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 10, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor