+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1449.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 19.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 12.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
June 19, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor