+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3272.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 18).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27).
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 27.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 14, 2017: Unfinished Business SB559 Morrell Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 13, 2017: SB 559 Morrell Senate Third Reading By KILEY
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
July 10, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
May 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB559
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
March 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor