+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 28 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and EQ.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
March 28, 2017: [First] hearing set for [03-28-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor