+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5445.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5444.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 19.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 12.
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 26, 2016: Unfinished Business SB554 Wolk Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 24, 2016: SB 554 Wolk Senate Third Reading By OLSEN
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
June 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB554 Wolk
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
January 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor